US HB929 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 349.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 349.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To take certain land in the State of Washington into trust for the benefit of the Puyallup Tribe of the Puyallup Reservation, and for other purposes.
Title
Puyallup Tribe of Indians Land Into Trust Confirmation Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 349. |
2024-03-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-423. |
2023-09-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-09-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-09-20 | House | Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs Discharged |
2023-07-12 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs . |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB382 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - Became Public Law No: 118-48.