US HCR48 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to commemorate the 50th anniversary of the Vietnam War. Authorizes the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center on July 8, 2015, for a ceremony to commemorate the 50th anniversary of the Vietnam War.
Title
Authorizing the use of Emancipation Hall in the Capitol Visitor Center for a ceremony to commemorate the 50th anniversary of the Vietnam War.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3728) |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-06-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-06-01 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3624) |
2015-06-01 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H3624) |
2015-06-01 | House | Mr. Harper asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. (consideration: CR H3624) |
2015-06-01 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2015-05-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on House Administration. |
2015-05-20 | House | Introduced in House |