US HJR1 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Title
Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. John Culberson [R-TX] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] |
Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] | Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] |
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] |
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA] |
Rep. Claudia Tenney [R-NY] | Rep. Evan Jenkins [R-WV] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR2 (Related) 2018-04-12 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 233 - 184 (Roll no. 138). (text: CR H3162)
HJR8 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR14 (Same As) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR18 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR98 (Related) 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR109 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR8 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR14 (Same As) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR18 (Related) 2017-01-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR98 (Related) 2017-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR109 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Budget deficits and national debt
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economic performance and conditions
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Economic performance and conditions
Economics and public finance
Income tax rates
Legislative rules and procedure
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-joint-resolution/1/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hjres1/BILLS-115hjres1ih.pdf |