US HJR37 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional Amendment - Limits Members of the House of Representatives to three terms and Members of the Senate to two terms.
Title
Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States limiting the number of times Senators and Representatives may be elected.
Sponsors
Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR48 (Related) 2013-06-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR101 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR108 (Related) 2014-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR101 (Related) 2014-01-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
HJR108 (Related) 2014-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
Congressional elections
Constitution and constitutional amendments
House of Representatives
Members of Congress
Senate
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-joint-resolution/37/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hjres37/BILLS-113hjres37ih.pdf |