US HJR43 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Treasury, the Department of Labor, and the Department of Health and Human Services relating to "Short-Term, Limited-Duration Insurance". This joint resolution nullifies a rule by the Department of Treasury, the Department of Labor, and the Department of Health and Human Services regarding short-term, limited-duration health insurance plans. Short-term, limited-duration health insurance plans are plans that may only offer coverage for a limited amount of time under law and that are exempt from the market requirements of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (e.g., coverage of individuals with preexisting conditions). The rule increases the maximum authorized duration of such plans from less than 3 months (including renewals) to an initial maximum duration of less than 12 months (with a total duration of up to 36 months, including renewals). The rule took effect October 2, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for congressional disapproval under chapter 8 of title 5, United States Code, of the final rule of the Department of the Treasury, the Department of Labor, and the Department of Health and Human Services relating to "Short-Term, Limited-Duration Insurance".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-06HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1010 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 29.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback