US HJR66 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Became Public Law No: 115-35. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Became Public Law No: 115-35. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to savings arrangements established by States for non-governmental employees. This joint resolution nullifies a rule submitted by the Department of Labor's Employee Benefits Security Administration regarding savings arrangements established by states for non-governmental employees. (The rule describes circumstances in which state payroll deduction savings programs with automatic enrollment would not give rise to the establishment of employee pension benefit plans under the Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974 [ERISA]. It provides guidance to states designing the programs to reduce the risk of ERISA preemption of state laws and private-sector employers that may be covered by the state laws.)
Title
Disapproving the rule submitted by the Department of Labor relating to savings arrangements established by States for non-governmental employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure RC# 119 (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 120 (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - On passage RC# 96 (Y: 231 N: 193 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 120 (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - On passage RC# 96 (Y: 231 N: 193 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-35. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 50 - 49. Record Vote Number: 120. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by motion. (consideration: CR S2692-2715) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Motion to proceed to consideration of measure agreed to in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 51 - 48. Record Vote Number: 119. (CR S2692) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-02-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-02-15 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 193 (Roll no. 96). (text: CR H1206) |
2017-02-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1221-1222) |
2017-02-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.J. Res. 66, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Bonamici demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on passage until a time to be announced. |
2017-02-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2017-02-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.J. Res. 66. |
2017-02-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 66 and H.J. Res. 67. Each joint resolution shall be considered as read. All points of order against provisions in each joint resolution are waived. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on each joint resolution without intervening motion except one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. |
2017-02-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 116. (consideration: CR H1206-1217) |
2017-02-13 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 116 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 66 and H.J. Res. 67. Each joint resolution shall be considered as read. All points of order against provisions in each joint resolution are waived. The previous question shall be considered as ordered on each joint resolution without intervening motion except one hour of debate and one motion to recommit. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HJR67 (Related) 2017-04-13 - Became Public Law No: 115-24. (TXT | PDF)
HR116 (Related) 2017-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR32 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR116 (Related) 2017-02-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SJR32 (Same As) 2017-03-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Department of Labor
Employee benefits and pensions
Labor and employment
State and local government operations
Congressional oversight
Department of Labor
Employee benefits and pensions
Labor and employment
State and local government operations