US HR1041 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of July 20, 2022, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Title
Supporting the designation of July 20, 2022, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] | Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Nancy Mace [R-SC] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
Rep. Maria Salazar [R-FL] | Rep. Young Kim [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR391 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR210 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: CR S2492)
SR614 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2292; text: CR S2282)
SR210 (Related) 2021-05-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: CR S2492)
SR614 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2292; text: CR S2282)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1041/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1041/BILLS-117hres1041ih.pdf |