US SR210 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: CR S2492)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: CR S2492)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating July 21, 2021, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Title
A resolution designating July 21, 2021, as "Glioblastoma Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] |
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2496; text: CR S2492) |
Same As/Similar To
HR391 (Related) 2021-05-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1041 (Related) 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR614 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2292; text: CR S2282)
HR1041 (Related) 2022-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR614 (Related) 2022-05-03 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2292; text: CR S2282)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/210/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres210/BILLS-117sres210ats.pdf |