US HR1059 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3798) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 30-hour threshold for classification as a full-time employee for purposes of the employer mandate in the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and replace it with 40 hours; providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from September 17, 2018, through September 24, 2018. Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3798) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 30-hour threshold for classification as a full-time employee for purposes of the employer mandate in the Patient Protection and Affordable Act and replace it with 40 hours; providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from September 17, 2018, through September 24, 2018.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3798) to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the 30-hour threshold for classification as a full-time employee for purposes of the employer mandate in the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and replace it with 40 hours; providing for consideration of the conference report to accompany the bill (H.B. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes; and providing for proceedings during the period from September 17, 2018, through September 24, 2018.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 397 (Y: 222 N: 171 NV: 35 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 222 - 171 (Roll no. 397). (text: CR H8181) |
2018-09-13 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. |
2018-09-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 1059. |
2018-09-13 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8181-8184) |
2018-09-12 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 183. |
2018-09-12 | House | Providing for consideration of H.R. 3798 and the conference report to accompany H.R. 5895. Both shall be debatable for one hour and are granted one motion to recommit with or without instructions. |
2018-09-12 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-949, by Mr. Sessions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3798 (Related) 2017-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.