US HR110 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-11)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-13 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Congratulates the National Football League (NFL) champion Pittsburgh Steelers for winning Super Bowl XLIII and setting a new championship standard for the entire NFL.
Title
Congratulating the National Football League champion Pittsburgh Steelers for winning Super Bowl XLIII and becoming the most successful franchise in NFL history with their record 6th Super Bowl title.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-13 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-02-13 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 2/12/2009 H1263) | |
2009-02-13 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1589) | |
2009-02-12 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Lynch objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-02-12 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 110. | |
2009-02-12 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1263-1267) | |
2009-02-12 | Mr. Lynch moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-02-11 | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-02-11 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-02-03 | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SR27 (Related) 2009-02-04 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1612-1613; text as passed Senate: CR S1613; text of measure as introduced: CR S1550)