US HR1126 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Pending: House Science, Space, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
Pending: House Science, Space, And Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Forensic Science Week.
Title
Recognizing and supporting the goals and ideals of National Forensic Science Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2020-09-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR722 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5877)
HR572 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SR320 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
HR572 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SR320 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Law enforcement officers
News media and reporting
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
Community life and organization
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Law enforcement officers
News media and reporting
Research administration and funding
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/1126/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres1126/BILLS-116hres1126ih.pdf |