US SR722 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5877)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5877)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Forensic Science Week.
Title
A resolution recognizing and supporting the goals and ideals of National Forensic Science Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5881; text: CR S5877) |
Same As/Similar To
HR572 (Related) 2019-09-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
HR1126 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SR320 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
HR1126 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
SR320 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5609; text: CR S5608)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/722/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres722/BILLS-116sres722ats.pdf |