US HR149 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for: (1) the designation of, and the goals and ideals of, Parkinson's Awareness Month; and (2) research to find better treatments and, eventually, a cure for Parkinson's disease. Recognizes those living with Parkinson's who participate in clinical trials. Commends the dedication of state, local, regional, and national organizations, volunteers, researchers, and millions of people in the United States working to improve the quality of life of persons with Parkinson's and their families.
Title
Expressing support for designation of April as Parkinson's Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2013-04-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E411) |
Same As/Similar To
SR118 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3060; text as passed Senate: CR S3047)
SR408 (Related) 2014-04-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2041; text as passed Senate: CR S1937)
SR408 (Related) 2014-04-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2041; text as passed Senate: CR S1937)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Congressional tributes
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Medical research
Neurological disorders
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/149/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres149/BILLS-113hres149ih.pdf |