US HR255 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commemorating the 30th anniversary of United States Special Operations Command. Commemorates the 30th anniversary of the U.S. Special Operations Command by honoring the U.S. Special Operations Forces community for their service and commitment to keeping the United States safe.
Title
Commemorating the 30th anniversary of United States Special Operations Command.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emerging Threats and Capabilities. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military command and structure
Military history
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Military command and structure
Military history
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents