US HR300 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the President and directing the Secretary of Defense to transmit, respectively, to the House of Representatives copies of all documents indicating any plans for current or future military assistance to Ukraine and documents indicating whether any United States Armed Forces, including special operations forces, are currently deployed in Ukraine.
Title
Requesting the President and directing the Secretary of Defense to transmit, respectively, to the House of Representatives copies of all documents indicating any plans for current or future military assistance to Ukraine and documents indicating whether any United States Armed Forces, including special operations forces, are currently deployed in Ukraine.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Marjorie Greene [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 15. |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 118-44. |
2023-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 20. |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2023-04-17 | House | Introduced in House |