US HR336 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the goals and ideals of National Library Week (April 12-18, 2009).
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Library Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Vernon Ehlers [R-MI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities. | |
2009-04-22 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-04-22 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4613-4614) | |
2009-04-22 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 336. | |
2009-04-22 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4613-4615) | |
2009-04-22 | Mr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-04-21 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1222 (Related) 2010-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.