US HR338 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the designation of April 30, 2023, as "National Adult Hepatitis B Vaccination Awareness Day".
Title
Expressing support for the designation of April 30, 2023, as "National Adult Hepatitis B Vaccination Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Jasmine Crockett [D-TX] | Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL] | Rep. Troy Carter [D-LA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR180 (Related) 2023-04-27 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S1422-1423)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/338/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres338/BILLS-118hres338ih.pdf |