US HR364 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates room HVC 215 of the Capitol Visitor Center as the "Gabriel Zimmerman Meeting Room."
Title
Designating room HVC 215 of the Capitol Visitor Center as the "Gabriel Zimmerman Meeting Room".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Agree (Y: 419 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-12-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 881). (text: CR 11/30/2011 H7943) |
2011-12-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8056-8057) |
2011-11-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 364. |
2011-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7943-7949) |
2011-11-30 | House | Mr. Fleischmann moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. |
2011-07-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2011-07-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |