US HR379 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing support for the designation of July as "American Grown Flower Month". This resolution supports the designation of American Grown Flower Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expressing support for the designation of July as "American Grown Flower Month".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
2019-05-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
2019-05-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR208 (Related) 2019-07-08 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 5/14/2019 S2835)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback