US HR405 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - For Further Action See H.Res.415.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - For Further Action See H.Res.415.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commends: (1) the people of North Dakota for their efforts in fighting the floods in North Dakota; and (2) the people from around the United States who assisted them. Expresses appreciation to the officials of the federal agencies working in North Dakota for their effective response to the disaster. Expresses support for the efforts of the communities of North Dakota to recover from the 2009 flooding and to improve protections against flooding in the future.
Title
Commending the heroic efforts of the people fighting the floods in North Dakota.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Pomeroy [D-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | For Further Action See H.Res.415. | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2009-05-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HR415 (Related) 2009-05-12 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR419 (Related) 2009-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR132 (Related) 2009-05-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5246; text as passed Senate: CR S5246; text of measure as introduced: CR S524)
HR419 (Related) 2009-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR132 (Related) 2009-05-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5246; text as passed Senate: CR S5246; text of measure as introduced: CR S524)
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Disaster relief and insurance
Floods and storm protection
Natural disasters
North Dakota
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-resolution/405/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hres405/BILLS-111hres405ih.pdf |