US HR52 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution sets forth the rule for consideration of H.J.Res. 28 (Further Additional Continuing Appropriations Act, 2019). It shall be in order at any time through the legislative day of January 25, 2019, for the Speaker of the House to suspend the rules.
Title
Providing for consideration of the joint resolution (H.J. Res. 28) making further continuing appropriations for fiscal year 2019, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 40 (Y: 230 N: 190 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-17 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 190 (Roll no. 40). (text: CR H683) |
2019-01-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H687-688) |
2019-01-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H. Res. 52, the Chair put the question on agreeing to resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. Lesko demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to H. Res. 52 until later in the legislative day. |
2019-01-17 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. |
2019-01-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 52. |
2019-01-17 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H683-687) |
2019-01-16 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 3. |
2019-01-16 | House | The resolution provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 28 under a closed rule with one motion to recommit. Also, the resolution provides that it shall be in order at any time through the legislative day of January 25, 2019, for the Speaker to entertain motions to suspend the rules. |
2019-01-16 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 116-3, by Ms. Scanlon. |
Same As/Similar To
HJR28 (Related) 2019-01-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-5. (TXT | PDF)
HR52 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR52 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.