US HR527 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Public Health Week. Recognizes the efforts of public health professionals, governments, tribes, and individuals in preventing disease and injury. Encourages increased efforts and resources to improve the health of people in the United States to create the healthiest nation in one generation through greater opportunities to improve community health and prevent disease and injury and through the strengthening of the public health system.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of National Public Health Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] |
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR124 (Related) 2013-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SR91 (Related) 2013-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2339)
SR415 (Related) 2014-04-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2202; text as passed Senate: CR S2201)
SR91 (Related) 2013-03-23 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2339)
SR415 (Related) 2014-04-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2202; text as passed Senate: CR S2201)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/527/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres527/BILLS-113hres527ih.pdf |