US HR538 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 104-20)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-24 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-24 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for Olympic Day.Encourages the International Olympic Committee to select Chicago, Illinois, as the host city for the 2016 Olympic and Paralympic Games.
Title
Supporting Olympic Day and encouraging the International Olympic Committee to select Chicago, Illinois, as the host city for the 2016 Olympic and Paralympic Games.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-24 | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-24 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-24 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 7/22/2009 H8546) | |
2009-07-24 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8726) | |
2009-07-22 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Smith (NJ) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2009-07-22 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 538. | |
2009-07-22 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8546-8547) | |
2009-07-22 | Mr. Klein (FL) moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. | |
2009-06-12 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SR178 (Related) 2009-06-09 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6390-6391; text as passed Senate: CR S6390-6391; text of measure as introduced: CR S6387)
HR1461 (Related) 2010-12-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR552 (Related) 2010-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5310)
HR1461 (Related) 2010-12-22 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR552 (Related) 2010-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5310)