US HR754 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-9)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) calls on Nicaragua to release all political prisoners and cease all acts of repression against dissenting voices, (2) urges the Nicaraguan government to respect its citizens' constitutional rights and implement electoral reforms, and (3) recognizes and encourages efforts to promote democracy in Nicaragua by holding corrupt actors and human rights abusers in the Nicaraguan government accountable for their actions.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives that the United States should continue to support the people of Nicaragua in their peaceful efforts to promote democracy and human rights, and use the tools under United States law to increase political and financial pressure on the government of Daniel Ortega.
Sponsors
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-03-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1543-1544) |
2020-03-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 754. |
2020-03-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1543-1545) |
2020-03-09 | House | Mr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended. |
2019-12-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-12-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR525 (Related) 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with amendments and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3017-3019; text: CR S3018-3019)
Subjects
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign loans and debt
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
News media and reporting
Nicaragua
Political movements and philosophies
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Foreign loans and debt
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
News media and reporting
Nicaragua
Political movements and philosophies
Religion
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status