US HR755 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the second Article of Impeachment by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 53. Record Vote Number: 34.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the second Article of Impeachment by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 53. Record Vote Number: 34.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution impeaches President Donald J. Trump for high crimes and misdemeanors. The resolution sets forth two articles of impeachment of the President: (1) abuse of power by soliciting the interference of Ukraine in the 2020 U.S. presidential election, and (2) obstruction of Congress by directing defiance of certain subpoenas issued by the House of Representatives.
Title
Impeaching Donald John Trump, President of the United States, for high crimes and misdemeanors.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the second Article of Impeachment RC# 34 (Y: 47 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-05 - Senate - The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the first Article of Impeachment RC# 33 (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-18 - House - On agreeing to Article II of the resolution RC# 696 (Y: 229 N: 198 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - On agreeing to Article I of the resolution RC# 695 (Y: 230 N: 197 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the first Article of Impeachment RC# 33 (Y: 48 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-18 - House - On agreeing to Article II of the resolution RC# 696 (Y: 229 N: 198 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - On agreeing to Article I of the resolution RC# 695 (Y: 230 N: 197 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the second Article of Impeachment by Yea-Nay Vote. 47 - 53. Record Vote Number: 34. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The Senate adjudges that Donald John Trump, President of the United States, is not guilty as charged in the first Article of Impeachment by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 52. Record Vote Number: 33. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-12-18 | House | Motion to reconsider Article II laid on the table. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-18 | House | Motion to reconsider Article I laid on the table. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-18 | House | On agreeing to Article II of the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 229 - 198, 1 Present (Roll no. 696). (text: CR H12131) |
2019-12-18 | House | On agreeing to Article I of the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 197, 1 Present (Roll no. 695). (text: CR H12130-12131) |
2019-12-18 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-12-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with six hours of debate on H. Res. 755. |
2019-12-18 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 755 with 6 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Bill is closed to amendments. The question of adoption of the resolution, as amended shall be divided between the two articles. The amendment in the nature of a substitute printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted After adoption of H. Res. 755, it shall be in order without intervention of any point of order to consider in the House a resolution appointing and authorizing managers for the impeachment trial if offered by the chair of the Committee on the Judiciary or his designee. |
2019-12-18 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 767. (consideration: CR H12130-12206) |
2019-12-18 | House | Rule H. Res. 767 passed House. |
2019-12-17 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 767 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 755 with 6 hours of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions. Bill is closed to amendments. The question of adoption of the resolution, as amended shall be divided between the two articles. The amendment in the nature of a substitute printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted After adoption of H. Res. 755, it shall be in order without intervention of any point of order to consider in the House a resolution appointing and authorizing managers for the impeachment trial if offered by the chair of the Committee on the Judiciary or his designee. |
2019-12-15 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 61. |
2019-12-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-346. |
2019-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended). |
2019-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-12-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR767 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Congress
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Ukraine
Congressional oversight
Congressional-executive branch relations
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government studies and investigations
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Ukraine