US HR857 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution recognizes the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing on the Japanese island of Iwo Jima that began on February 19, 1945, and ended on March 26, 1945, and encourages the people of the United States to honor the veterans of the Battle of Iwo Jima with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.
Title
Recognizing the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing on the Japanese island of Iwo Jima during World War II and the raisings of the flag of the United States on Mount Suribachi.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR502 (Related) 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3016; text: 02/13/2020 CR S1079-1080)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Intergovernmental relations
Japan
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
U.S. history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Intergovernmental relations
Japan
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
U.S. history
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/857/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres857/BILLS-116hres857ih.pdf |