US SR502 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3016; text: 02/13/2020 CR S1079-1080)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution recognizing the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing on the Japanese island of Iwo Jima during World War II and the raisings of the flag of the United States on Mount Suribachi. This resolution recognizes the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing on the Japanese island of Iwo Jima that began on February 19, 1945, and ended on March 26, 1945, and encourages the people of the United States to honor the veterans of the Battle of Iwo Jima with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution recognizing the 75th anniversary of the amphibious landing on the Japanese island of Iwo Jima during World War II and the raisings of the flag of the United States on Mount Suribachi.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3016; text: 02/13/2020 CR S1079-1080)
2020-06-03SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 468.
2020-06-03SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report.
2020-05-21SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2020-02-13SenateReferred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Same As/Similar To

HR857 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback