US HR882 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
Pending: House Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution (1) supports the designation of National Blueberry Month; and (2) recognizes the contributions of American growers and their families, and that purchasing American grown blueberries supports farmers, jobs, and the economy.
Title
Recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States of America and supporting the designation of July 2020 as "National Blueberry Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] |
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR528 (Related) 2020-03-04 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S1479)
SR656 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: 07/22/2020 CR S4428-4429)
SR656 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4650; text: 07/22/2020 CR S4428-4429)
Subjects
Agriculture and food
Commemorative events and holidays
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Fruit and vegetables
Commemorative events and holidays
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Fruit and vegetables
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/882/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres882/BILLS-116hres882ih.pdf |