US HR923 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3) to rescind certain budget authority proposed to be rescinded in special messages transmitted to the Congress by the President on May 8, 2018, in accordance with title X of the Congressional Budget and Impoundment Control Act 1974.
Title
Providing for further consideration of the bill (H.B. 5895) making appropriations for energy and water development and related agencies for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2019, and for other purposes, and providing for consideration of the bill (H.B. 3) to rescind certain budget authority proposed to be rescinded in special messages transmitted to the Congress by the President on May 8, 2018, in accordance with title X of the Congressional Budget and Impoundment Control Act 1974.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - House - On ordering the previous question RC# 240 (Y: 227 N: 185 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 241 (Y: 225 N: 187 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 241 (Y: 225 N: 187 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-07 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by recorded vote: 225 - 187 (Roll no. 241). (text: CR H4862) |
2018-06-07 | House | On ordering the previous question Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 227 - 185 (Roll no. 240). |
2018-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 923. |
2018-06-07 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H4862-4869) |
2018-06-06 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 151. |
2018-06-06 | House | The resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 5895 under a structured rule. Also, the rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. The resolution provides for one motion |
2018-06-06 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 115-712, by Mr. Burgess. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Related) 2018-06-20 - Motion to discharge Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget rejected by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 50. Record Vote Number: 134.
HR923 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HR923 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.