US SB1027 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-12-1)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to extend the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000. This bill extends the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000 through FY2017, including provisions concerning secure payments to eligible states, territories, and counties containing federal land. The bill: (1) sets forth special rules for state and county payments for FY2016, and (2) requires all FY2016 payments to be made within 45 days of enactment of this bill. No funds made available to eligible counties under such Act may be used in lieu of, or to otherwise offset, a state funding source for a local school, facility, or educational purpose. The merchantable timber contracting pilot program is repealed. The bill extends through FY2019 the authority under such Act to initiate special projects on such federal lands and certain county activities.
Title
A bill to extend the Secure Rural Schools and Community Self-Determination Act of 2000.
Sponsors
Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2340 (Same As) 2017-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
SB3645 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3753 (Related) 2018-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7588)
SB3645 (Related) 2018-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3753 (Related) 2018-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7588)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Civil actions and liability
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Property tax
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local taxation
Civil actions and liability
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Property tax
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
State and local finance
State and local taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1027/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1027/BILLS-115s1027is.pdf |