US SB1052 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rare Earth Element Advanced Coal Technologies Act This bill requires the Department of Energy's Office of Fossil Energy to create a program for the development of advanced separation technology to extract and recover rare earth elements and minerals from coal and coal byproducts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rare Earth Element Advanced Coal Technologies Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 176.
2019-08-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-74.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
2019-05-14SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
2019-04-04SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback