US SB1088 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Pending: House Oversight And Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill expresses the sense of Congress that all agencies should strive to provide high-quality, courteous, effective, and efficient services and seek to measure, collect, report, and utilize metrics relating to the experience of persons interacting with them to continually improve services. (Sec. 4) The bill amends the Paperwork Reduction Act to exempt the collection of information by an agency that is voluntary feedback from the agency's authority to prescribe policies, rules, regulations, and procedures for federal information resources management activities. "Voluntary feedback" is defined as any submission of information, opinion, or concern voluntarily made by a specific person relating to a particular service of or transaction with an agency that is specifically solicited by that agency. (Sec. 5) Each agency that solicits voluntary feedback shall, among other things, ensure that: responses to the solicitation remain anonymous, person who decline to participate shall not be treated differently by the agency for purposes of providing services or information, the voluntary nature of the solicitation is clear, and the proposed solicitation of voluntary feedback will contribute to improved customer service. (Sec. 6) Each agency shall collect voluntary feedback with respect to its services and transactions. The Office of Management and Budget (OMB), in coordination with the General Services Administration, shall develop a set of standardized questions for use by agencies in collecting feedback, which shall address: overall satisfaction of persons with the specific interaction or service received, the extent to which such persons were able to accomplish their intended purpose, whether such persons were treated with respect and professionalism, and whether such persons believe they were served in a timely manner. Each agency shall: (1) collect voluntary feedback across all platforms or channels through which it interacts with persons to deliver information or services, (2) publish on its website and submit to the OMB a report that includes the voluntary feedback required to be collected, and (3) regularly publish an aggregated report on the solicitation of voluntary feedback. The OMB shall maintain on a publicly available website links to the information provided on the agency websites. (Sec. 7) The Government Accountability Office shall, by 15 months after the date on which all agencies have submitted the first annual reports and every 2 years thereafter until 10 years after such date, make publicly available and submit to Congress a scorecard report assessing the data collected and reported by the agencies.
Title
Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
2017-11-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7068) |
2017-11-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.1580 Amendment SA 1580 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-07 | Senate | S.Amdt.1580 Amendment SA 1580 proposed by Senator Daines for Senator McCaskill. (consideration: CR S7067-7068; text: CR S7067-7068) To improve the bill. |
2017-11-07 | Senate | The committee amendments agreed to by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7066-7068) |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 220. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 115-156. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2846 (Related) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Performance measurement