US SB1125 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2934)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2934)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Our Gold Star Families' Education Act of 2017 This bill amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to require the Department of Education (ED) to move the Iraq and Afghanistan Service Grants under the Pell Grant program. ED must award the Iraq and Afghanistan Service Grants to each eligible veteran's dependent for assisting with the costs of attending colleges and universities. Students are eligible for an award if: (1) their parent or guardian died as a result of military service in Iraq or Afghanistan after September 11, 2001, and (2) they are less than 24 years of age and enrolled at an institution at the time of the parent or guardian's death. Pell Grant rules pertaining to the determination of financial need do not apply to the Iraq and Afghanistan Service Grants.
Title
Protect Our Gold Star Families' Education Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2934) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2451 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB1136 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4074 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB6543 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB1136 (Related) 2017-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB4074 (Related) 2017-10-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition.
HB6543 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Afghanistan
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Education
Higher education
Iraq
Middle East
Military personnel and dependents
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Asia
Conflicts and wars
Education
Higher education
Iraq
Middle East
Military personnel and dependents
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1125/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1125/BILLS-115s1125is.pdf |