US SB1148 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to give preferential consideration to employment applications of air traffic control specialists (1) who have completed air traffic controller training and graduated from an institution participating in the Collegiate Training Initiative program, or (2) who are veterans. The bill also requires (1) the FAA to submit semi-annual reports to Congress on the hiring and training of air traffic controllers, (2) the FAA to give preferential consideration to applicants who gained air traffic control experience at a National Guard facility, and (3) the Inspector General of the Department of Transportation to conduct a review that assesses the assumptions and methodologies used by the FAA in developing the air traffic controller pre-employment test.
Title
ATC Hiring Reform Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 319. |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment. With written report No. 116-169. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Employee hiring
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation