US SB1173 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-09 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 the Emergency Medical Services for Children grant program. The program is administered by the Health Resources and Services Administration and focuses on improving emergency health care for children who are seriously ill or injured.
Title
Emergency Medical Services for Children Program Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB776 (Related) 2019-08-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-49. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Child health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
State and local finance
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health programs administration and funding
State and local finance