US SB143 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 172.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Energy Veterans' Health Initiative Act This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a research program in artificial intelligence and high-performance computing that is focused on the development of tools to (1) solve big data challenges associated with veterans' health care, and (2) support the Department of Veterans Affairs in identifying potential health risks and challenges. DOE shall carry out a pilot program to develop tools for big data analytics in order to advance artificial intelligence technologies to solve complex big data challenges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Energy Veterans' Health Initiative Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 172.
2019-08-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-70.
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-07-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
2019-01-16SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB617 (Same As) 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback