US SB1523 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-162. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-20 - Became Public Law No: 114-162. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the National Estuary Program, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill amends the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act) to revise the National Estuary Program by requiring the Environmental Protection Agency to make competitive awards to address urgent and challenging issues that threaten the economic and ecological well-being of coastal areas, including: extensive seagrass habitat losses, recurring harmful algae blooms, unusual marine mammal mortalities, invasive exotic species, jellyfish proliferation limiting community access to water during peak tourism seasons, flooding that may be related to sea level rise or wetland degradation or loss, and low dissolved oxygen conditions in estuarine waters and related nutrient management. (Sec. 2) The bill authorizes appropriations for FY2017-FY2021 for: (1) EPA administrative expenses relating to a grant or award, and (2) making grants and awards. The bill allocates funding for conservation and management plans for estuaries and for competitive awards.
Title
A bill to amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the National Estuary Program, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-162. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-05-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2016-05-18 | House | Presented to President. |
2016-05-13 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-05-12 | House | Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate bill by Unanimous Consent. (text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S2794) |
2016-04-27 | House | Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill. |
2016-04-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-04-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1958) |
2016-04-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1523. |
2016-04-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1957-1959) |
2016-04-26 | House | Mr. Gibbs moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-10-29 | House | By Senator Inhofe from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 114-161. |
2015-09-08 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-09-08 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6349-6350) |
2015-08-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.2639 Amendment SA 2639 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | S.Amdt.2639 Amendment SA 2639 proposed by Senator Whitehouse. (consideration: CR S6349; text: CR S6349) |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6349-6350) |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-08-05 | Senate | Committee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB573 (Related) 2015-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB944 (Related) 2015-06-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB944 (Related) 2015-06-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Lakes and rivers
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Pest management
Water quality
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Executive agency funding and structure
Floods and storm protection
Lakes and rivers
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Pest management
Water quality
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection