US SB1570 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-324.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Indian Health Service Advance Appropriations Act of 2013 - Amends the Indian Health Care Improvement Act to require that for each fiscal year, beginning with FY2015, discretionary new budget authority for the Indian Health Services and Indian Health Facilities accounts of the Indian Health Service includes advance discretionary new budget authority for the following fiscal year. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to include in documents submitted to Congress in support of the President's budget for each of those fiscal years detailed estimates of the funds needed for such accounts for the fiscal year following the fiscal year for which the budget is submitted. Requires the President's budget to include information on estimates of those advanced appropriations.
Title
Indian Health Service Advance Appropriations Act of 2013
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] |
Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI] | Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 113-324. |
2013-10-16 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7534) |
2013-10-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3229 (Same As) 2014-07-15 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Appropriations
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Native Americans
Department of Health and Human Services
Executive agency funding and structure
Health facilities and institutions
Health programs administration and funding
Indian social and development programs
Minority health
Native Americans
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/1570/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s1570/BILLS-113s1570is.pdf |