US SB1759 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keeping Our Commitment to Ending Veteran Homelessness Act of 2017 This bill extends through FY2018 authority for the following Department of Veterans Affairs programs: homeless veterans reintegration programs, the homeless women veterans and homeless veterans with children reintegration program, referral and counseling services for certain veterans at risk of homelessness, treatment and rehabilitation services for seriously mentally ill and homeless veterans, housing assistance for homeless veterans, financial assistance for supportive services for very low-income veteran families in permanent housing, and the grant program for homeless veterans with special needs. The bill extends through December 31, 2018, authority for the Advisory Committee on Homeless Veterans.
Title
Keeping Our Commitment to Ending Veteran Homelessness Act of 2017
Sponsors
Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Dean Heller [R-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-03 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4898 (Related) 2018-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
SB3419 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB3419 (Related) 2018-09-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-bill/1759/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/s1759/BILLS-115s1759is.pdf |