US SB1773 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Territories Health Equity Act of 2019 This bill alters provisions under Medicaid, Medicare, and Medicare Advantage relating to U.S. territories, and generally modifies and establishes programs to expand health insurance coverage for residents. Among other things, the bill eliminates Medicaid funding limitations for U.S. territories beginning in FY2020, repeals provisions that exclude residents of Puerto Rico from a certain automatic enrollment process for Medicare medical services, establishes minimum criteria for certain elements used in Medicare Advantage payment calculations for areas within U.S. territories, and allows residents of U.S. territories who are unable to obtain health insurance through their employer or a health insurance exchange to instead obtain coverage that is at least as broad as the coverage available to Members of Congress and their staff through the District of Columbia exchange.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Territories Health Equity Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Same As/Similar To

HB1354 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3634 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6495 (Related) 2020-04-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback