US SB1840 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 317.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 317.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize and improve the National Breast and Cervical Cancer Early Detection Program for fiscal years 2024 through 2028, and for other purposes.
Title
SCREENS for Cancer Act of 2023 Screening for Communities to Receive Early and Equitable Needed Services for Cancer Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 317. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Sanders with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2023-12-12 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3916 (Same As) 2024-03-20 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 46 - 0.