US SB1857 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fairness for High-Skilled Immigrants Act - Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to: (1) eliminate the per country numerical limitation for employment-based immigrants, and (2) increase the per country numerical limitation for family based immigrants. Amends the Chinese Student Protection Act of 1992 to eliminate the provision requiring the reduction of annual Chinese immigrant visas to offset status adjustments under such Act.
Title
Fairness for High-Skilled Immigrants Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3012 (Same As) 2012-01-23 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 293.
HB3119 (Related) 2011-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
HB3476 (Related) 2012-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
SB1866 (Related) 2011-11-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7594-7596)
SB1983 (Related) 2011-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB3119 (Related) 2011-10-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement.
HB3476 (Related) 2012-01-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
SB1866 (Related) 2011-11-16 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7594-7596)
SB1983 (Related) 2011-12-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-bill/1857/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/s1857/BILLS-112s1857is.pdf |