US SB2062 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to increase the security of United States rail infrastructure along the North American Interchange Service to the direct and indirect supply of U.S. military and related institutions, to facilitate cross-border trade among the United States, Mexico, or Canada, and for other purposes.
Title
SAFE TRAINS Act Stopping America’s Foreign Enemies Through Rail And Infrastructure National Security Act
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3341 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB2016 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
HB3684 (Related) 2022-08-04 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.
SB2016 (Related) 2021-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 227.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/2062/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s2062/BILLS-117s2062is.pdf |