US SB2071 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals outdated provisions regarding treatment of Native Americans, including provisions on hostile tribes, alcohol, work requirements, penalties for truancy, and placement of youth in reform school without the consent of a parent or guardian.
Title
Repealing Existing Substandard Provisions Encouraging Conciliation with Tribes Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-11-19 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6628-6629; text: CR S6628-6629) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 252. |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-132. |
2019-07-17 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3684 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.