US SB2101 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-23-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-338.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-23-2)
Status: Passed on December 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-338.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
USS Indianapolis Congressional Gold Medal Act
Title
USS Indianapolis Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 115-338. |
2018-12-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2018-12-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2018-12-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-12-12 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H10157) |
2018-12-12 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10157) |
2018-12-12 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2018-12-12 | House | Mr. Barr asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2018-08-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2018-08-03 | House | Received in the House. |
2018-08-02 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5560-5561) |
2018-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.3688 Amendment SA 3688 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | S.Amdt.3688 Amendment SA 3688 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Donnelly. (consideration: CR S5560; text: CR S5560) To improve the bill. |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5560-5561) |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4107 (Related) 2017-10-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Indiana
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Indiana
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers