US SB2177 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2-1)
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-28 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Office of Management and Budget to expand the information it publishes in its inventory of agency programs. The inventory must include information such as links to program performance reviews and details regarding financial assistance.
Title
Taxpayers Right-To-Know Act
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Rand Paul [R-KY] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Kelly Loeffler [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275. |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-154. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3830 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement
Executive agency funding and structure
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Performance measurement