US SB219 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-27.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-27.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Susquehanna Gateway National Heritage Area Act - Establishes the Susquehanna Gateway National Heritage Area in Pennsylvania. Designates the Susquehanna Heritage Corporation as the local coordinating entity for the Area. Requires the Corporation to prepare and submit a management plan for the Area.
Title
Susquehanna Gateway National Heritage Area Act
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 113-27. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2200 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
SB1237 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
SB1237 (Related) 2014-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Subjects
Historic sites and heritage areas
Historical and cultural resources
Outdoor recreation
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
Historical and cultural resources
Outdoor recreation
Pennsylvania
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/219/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s219/BILLS-113s219is.pdf |