US SB2283 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-09 - By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-401. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-09 - By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-401. Additional views filed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Broadband Deployment Act of 2016 (Sec. 2) This bill exempts any small business broadband Internet access service provider with not more than 250,000 subscribers from the enhancements to the transparency rule of the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) under which any person providing broadband Internet access service must disclose publicly accurate information regarding the network management practices, performance, and commercial terms of its broadband Internet access services sufficient for: consumers to make informed choices regarding their use; and content, application, service, and device providers to develop, market, and maintain Internet offerings. The FCC shall: report to Congress, within 180 days of enactment of this bill, its recommendations (including supporting data) on whether the exception should be made permanent, and whether the definition of "small business," for purposes of the exception, should be modified; and within 180 days after such report, commence a rulemaking proceeding to implement the recommendations. This small business exception shall terminate after the later of: (1) three years after enactment of this bill; or (2) the date on which the FCC adopts rules in its rulemaking proceeding for implementing its recommendations.
Title
Small Business Broadband Deployment Act of 2016
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] | Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-09 | Senate | By Senator Thune from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 114-401. Additional views filed. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 698. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Thune with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2015-11-16 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S7969; text of measure as introduced: CR S7969-7970) |
Same As/Similar To
HB2666 (Related) 2016-04-21 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 431.
HB4596 (Related) 2016-03-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4596 (Related) 2016-03-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Small business
Telecommunication rates and fees
Consumer affairs
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Internet and video services
Science, technology, communications
Small business
Telecommunication rates and fees