US SB230 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 114-56. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-30 - Became Public Law No: 114-56. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to provide for the conveyance of certain property to the Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation located in Bethel, Alaska. (Sec. 1) Directs the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to convey to the Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation in Bethel, Alaska, all interest of the United States in certain property (including all land and appurtenances) containing 22.98 acres, for use in connection with health and social services programs. States that this conveyance by warranty deed shall supersede and render of no future effect any quitclaim deed to the property executed by HHS and the Corporation. Declares that this conveyance: (1) shall be made by warranty deed; and (2) shall not require any consideration from the Corporation for the property, impose any obligation, term, or condition on the Corporation, or allow for any U.S. reversionary interest in the property. (Sec. 3) Shields the Corporation from being liable for soil, surface water, groundwater, or other contamination resulting from the disposal, release, or presence of environmental contamination (including oil or petroleum products, hazardous substances, hazardous materials, hazardous waste, pollutants, toxic substances, solid waste, or any other environmental contamination or hazard under any federal or Alaska law). Accords to HHS any easement or access to the conveyed property as may be necessary to satisfy any retained obligations and liability. Requires the HHS to be in compliance with requirements under the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 respecting certain deeds for the transfer of U.S. owned real property on which any hazardous substance was stored for one year or more, disposed of, or known to have been released.
Title
A bill to provide for the conveyance of certain property to the Yukon Kuskokwim Health Corporation located in Bethel, Alaska.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-30 | House | Became Public Law No: 114-56. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-09-30 | House | Signed by President. |
2015-09-21 | House | Presented to President. |
2015-09-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-09-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6002) |
2015-09-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 230. |
2015-09-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6002-6003) |
2015-09-16 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-06-25 | House | Held at the desk. |
2015-06-25 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-06-25 | House | Received in the House. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4656-4657) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | S.Amdt.2077 Amendment SA 2077 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | S.Amdt.2077 Amendment SA 2077 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Murkowski. (consideration: CR S4656-4657; text: CR S4656-4657) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4656-4657) |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 78. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. With written report No. 114-38. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB521 (Same As) 2015-07-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 163.
Subjects
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Public lands and natural resources
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Health facilities and institutions
Land transfers
Minority health
Public lands and natural resources