US SB2535 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 633.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 633.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Commerce to conduct an assessment and analysis of the reasons underlying the decreasing rate of formation of new businesses (i.e., startups) in the United States.
Title
Enhancing Entrepreneurship for the 21st Century Act
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 633. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment. Without written report. |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4960 (Same As) 2019-11-21 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H9160-9161)
Subjects
Aging
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Financial crises and stabilization
General business and commerce matters
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Student aid and college costs
Women in business
Business investment and capital
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Financial crises and stabilization
General business and commerce matters
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Student aid and college costs
Women in business